FL S1502 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Transferring and reassigning functions and responsibilities of the Division of Law Enforcement relating to investigators of environmental crimes within the Fish and Wildlife Conservation Commission to the Division of Law Enforcement of the Department of Environmental Protection; providing requirements for a memorandum of agreement between the department and the commission regarding the responsibilities of the department and the commission; establishing the Division of Law Enforcement within the department, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Environmental Protection

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2019-04-10SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/09/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-26SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2019-03-26SenateFavorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/26/19, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-02-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H5401 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
258004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
258008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
258501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282709Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316640Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3763071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403413Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
790166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
843085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
87004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9327055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback