FL S1502 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain information to be included in contracts of specified individuals and corporations; providing that the definition of the term "proprietary business information" does not include certain information relating to the amount paid under specified contracts between a private corporation, partnership, or person and an economic development agency; revising the information an economic development agency is required to disclose after a specified period, etc.
Title
Disclosure of Contract Information by Individuals or Entities Receiving Public Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 0104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
688 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1502 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1502/BillText/Filed/HTML |