FL S1478 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-15 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-15 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the expiration of provisions authorizing advanced cost recovery for nuclear and integrated gasification combined cycle power plants; requiring certain funds to be returned to ratepayers; prohibiting utilities from continuing to collect advanced costs for certain plants after a specified date, etc.
Title
Utility Advanced Cost Recovery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from further consideration |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0395 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
H4057 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
H4057 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
366 | 93 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 95 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 519 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1478 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1478/BillText/Filed/HTML |