FL S1474 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Commission on Ethics and the Elections Commission to notify the Chief Financial Officer or the governing body of a county, municipality, or special district, as appropriate, of any fines owed to it by a person who has been elected to a state, county, municipal, or special district office, etc.
Title
Elected Officials
Sponsors
Sen. Nan Rich [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Subreferred to Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections -SJ 200 | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to Rules; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 168 | |
2011-03-01 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1474 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1474/BillText/Filed/HTML |