FL S1472 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Medicinal Cannabis Research and Education Act"; establishing the Coalition for Medicinal Cannabis Research and Education within the H. Lee Moffitt Cancer Center and Research Institute, Inc.; establishing the Medicinal Cannabis Research and Education Board to direct the operations of the coalition; requiring the board to advise specified entities and officials regarding medicinal cannabis research and education in this state; specifying responsibilities of the H. Lee Moffitt Cancer Center and Research Institute, Inc., etc.
Title
Medicinal Cannabis Research and Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/27/17, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1177 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
S406 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table
H1397 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in House
S406 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table
H1397 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in House
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1472 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1472/BillText/Filed/HTML |