FL S1464 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1363
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1363
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting contracts awarded by certain entities outside this state from being used to procure contracts with manufacturers or vendors of camera systems used for traffic enforcement; prohibiting a governmental entity from knowingly entering into or renewing certain contracts for camera systems used for traffic enforcement; requiring certain counties or municipalities to enact an ordinance to authorize placement or installation of traffic infraction detectors, etc.
Title
Traffic Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1363 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1363 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/24 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-28 | Senate | CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 18 NAYS 1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 3 NAYS 2 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/20/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/06/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1363 (Same As) 2024-03-06 - Ordered enrolled
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 0077 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 0078 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 0083 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |