FL S1464 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1095
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising and providing noncriminal violations relating to the transportation of certain hazardous materials; requiring certain persons to transmit an incident report to the State Fire Marshal; providing that certain incident reports must be investigated by the State Fire Marshal or his or her agents; requiring Sunshine State One-Call of Florida, Inc., to review certain reports and complaints, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Underground Facility Damage Prevention and Safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1095
2020-03-09SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 1095
2020-03-09SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20
2020-03-02SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-27SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-26SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-13SenateCS/CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2020-02-13SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-11SenateCS/CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-02-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/11/20, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-30SenateNow in Banking and Insurance
2020-01-29SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-29SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-27SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/27/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2020-01-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1095 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-137
H487 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 1092 passed
S1092 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-96

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
556102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
556107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
556116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
556117Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback