FL S1452 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 963
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 963
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing sheriffs who provide child protective investigative services to carry forward a certain percentage of unexpended state funds each fiscal year; requiring certain funds to be returned to the Department of Children and Families; prohibiting funds carried forward from being used in certain ways; requiring that certain expenditures be reported to the department; authorizing unexpended funds to be retained through contract or grant agreement renewals under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Funding for Sheriffs Providing Child Protective Investigative Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 963 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 963 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/22/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-26 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H963 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-58