FL S1448 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a parent to enroll his or her child in and transport his or her child to any public school that has not reached capacity, including charter schools, in any school district in this state; clarifying requirements for the creation of a virtual charter school; revising conditions for termination of a virtual instruction provider's contract; establishing the Florida Charter School Innovation Institute, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Choice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-01SenateDied in Education Pre-K - 12
2015-03-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/11/15, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Discussed/Workshop
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-03-03SenateReferred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2015-02-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1552 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
H1145 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
H7037 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100237Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003498Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10035711Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10046491Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback