FL S1448 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the sale or lease of a county, district, or municipal hospital is subject to approval by the registered voters or by the circuit court. Requires the hospital governing board to determine by certain public advertisements whether there are qualified purchasers of lessees before the sale or lease of such hospital. Requires the board to file a petition for approval with the circuit court and receive approval before any transaction is finalized, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sale/Lease/County, District, or Municipal Hospital

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-27 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-04-25 CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 2 -SJ 541
2011-04-20 On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/25/11, 9:45 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2011-04-07 On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/12/11, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2011-04-06 Now in Judiciary -SJ 324
2011-04-05 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-04-04 CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 -SJ 324
2011-03-29 On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/04/11, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2011-03-22 Favorable by Health Regulation; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 270
2011-03-17 On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/22/11, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2011-03-09 Referred to Health Regulation; Community Affairs; Judiciary; Budget; Rules -SJ 165
2011-02-28 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15540Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3953036Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback