FL S1438 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring public schools to screen all students in kindergarten through grade 3 for dyslexia within a certain timeframe; requiring public school students with a substantial deficiency in reading to be placed in an intensive remedial intervention program; requiring public schools to have at least one person on staff with specified certification in reading instruction for students with dyslexia; creating the Dyslexia Task Force within the Department of Education, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dyslexia

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-06SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2020-02-04SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2020-02-04SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-03SenateCS by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2020-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 02/03/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2020-01-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1411 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10012151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10023105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100243Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100326Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003575Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100824Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10122315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4141251Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback