FL S1434 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes an amendment to the State Constitution to disqualify a person who is convicted of a felony from voting, holding public office, or serving on a jury only while the person is incarcerated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil Rights of Ex-Felons [GPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Ethics and Elections; Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules -SJ 00103
2010-02-03 Referred to Ethics and Elections; Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2010-01-26 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00604Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback