FL S1430 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a chief data officer within the Agency for State Technology who shall be appointed by the executive director; authorizing the Agency for State Technology to oversee the transition of various licenses and identification cards to an optional digital proof of the licenses and identification cards for a specified fee; requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles, in coordination with the Agency for State Technology, to develop, rather than begin to review and prepare for the development of, a system for issuing an optional digital proof of driver license for a specified fee, subject to certain requirements, etc.
Title
State Technology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2016-03-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/16, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 02/24/16, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-10 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/09/16, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1195 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 0051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 354 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |