FL S1428 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7028 (Ch. 2016-215)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7028 (Ch. 2016-215)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging the State Board of Administration to determine which publicly traded companies in which the Florida Retirement System Trust Fund is invested operate in Northern Ireland; encouraging the state board to take certain action upon making a determination; providing that the state board is not liable or subject to a cause of action under the act, etc.
Title
State Investments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7028 (Ch. 2016-215) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/16, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 02/11/16, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/01/16, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7028 (Similar To) 2016-04-08 - Chapter No. 2016-215
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1428 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1428/BillText/Filed/HTML |