FL S1420 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring employers to facilitate service by making employees available to accept service; increasing penalties for employers who fail to facilitate service; authorizing service on the registered agents of limited liability companies and corporations and other specified persons at any hour at a residence or personal mailbox; authorizing certified process servers to serve any nonenforceable civil process, etc.
Title
Service of Process
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1420 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1420/BillText/Filed/HTML |