FL S1420 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-27 - CS by Education read 1st time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting sponsors from refusing to receive a charter school application submitted during the calendar year; revising how charter schools operated by not-for-profit or municipal entities may use certain unrestricted current and capital assets; specifying how many applications a high-performing charter school may submit in any school district in the state to establish and operate a new charter school; revising the virtual instruction a virtual charter school may provide, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charter Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-27SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2020-01-23SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2020-01-22SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-21SenateCS by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 01/21/20, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2020-01-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1029 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100245Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback