FL S1420 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a prohibition on private entities providing probationary or supervision services to certain misdemeanor offenders, etc.
Title
Probationary or Supervision Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/12/18, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H917 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1420 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1420/BillText/Filed/HTML |