FL S1416 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the term "municipality of special financial concern." Requires the state land planning agency to grant a waiver from requirements relating to updating the capital improvements element of the comprehensive plan and amendments updating the regional water supply plan to certain municipal applicants who meet specified criteria. Requires the state land planning agency to grant a waiver of requirements to certain municipal applicants who meet specified criteria, etc.
Title
Small Municipalities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 107 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Community Affairs; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget -SJ 107 | |
2011-02-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0379 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 3164 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3177 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1416 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1416/BillText/Filed/HTML |