FL S1414 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1443 (Ch. 2014-253)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1443 (Ch. 2014-253)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "Ocala Downtown Community Redevelopment Area"; authorizing the Division of Alcoholic Beverages and Tobacco of the Department of Business and Professional Regulation to issue to a bona fide nonprofit civic organization a specified number of additional temporary permits to sell alcoholic beverages for consumption on the premises at certain events in the Ocala Downtown Community Redevelopment Area; providing requirements to obtain the temporary permit; requiring the division to adopt rules, etc.
Title
City of Ocala, Marion County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1443 (Ch. 2014-253) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Rules |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1443 (Same As) 2014-06-25 - Chapter No. 2014-253
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1414 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1414/BillText/Filed/HTML |