FL S1402 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Defining the term "state assumed waters"; providing the Department of Environmental Protection with the power and authority to adopt rules to assume and implement the section 404 dredge and fill permitting program pursuant to the federal Clean Water Act; requiring the department to adopt rules to create an expedited permit review process, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Assumption of Federal Section 404 Dredge and Fill Permitting Authority

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 7043
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted HB 7043
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-22SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-15SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources, 02/14/18, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-22SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources
2018-01-22SenateFavorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/22/18, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations
2017-12-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7043 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-88

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3734146Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback