FL S1402 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding the entities that have oversight over local governmental entities, charter schools, charter technical career centers, and district school boards under certain circumstances; providing that certain board members of a local governmental entity or district school board who fail to vote affirmatively to take certain actions in certain circumstances are subject to suspension by the Governor, etc.
Title
Local Governmental Financial Emergencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations; YEAS 14 NAYS 4 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/13/17, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Appropriations; Rules |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education |
2017-04-04 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/03/17, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1289 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
218 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |