FL S1396 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits an inmate from receiving incentive gain-time credits for completing the requirements for and receiving a general educational development certificate or vocational certificate if the inmate was convicted of a specified offense on or after a specified date.
Title
Incentive Gain-time [WPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-06 - House - House Roll Call No. 0685 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0015 - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0015 - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Conference Committee | |
2010-04-19 | Conference Committee appointed: Rivera, Flores, Bullard, Clarke-Reed, Coley, Fresen, Kiar, Legg, Stargel, Proctor, Brise, Burgin, Jones, McKeel, O'Toole, Reed, Glorioso, Gibson, Jenne, Horner, Hukill, Murzin, Rogers, Schenck, Adams, Eisnaugle, Holder, Kreegel, Porth, Rouson, Soto, Tobia, Hays, Abruzzo, Braynon, Gonzalez, Nelson, Ray, Workman, Williams, A., Grimsley, Chestnut, Ford, Frishe, Hudson, Roberson, Y., Skidmore, Thompson, N., Poppell, Bembry, Boyd, Brandenburg, Crisafulli, Plakon, Precourt, Williams, T., Bogdanoff, Aubuchon, Bernard, Carroll, Dorworth, Patronis, Fitzgerald, Thurston, Galvano, Gibbons, Hasner, Lopez-Cantera, Reagan, Sands, Thompson, G., Weatherford, McBurney -HJ 00735 | |
2010-04-16 | Conference Committee appointed: Senators Alexander, Chair; Haridopolos, Vice Chair; Altman, Bennett, Justice, Ring, Storms, At Large; Criminal & Civil Justice: Crist, Chair; Jones, Joyner, Villalobos, Wilson; Education Pre-K-12: Wise, Chair; Bullard, Detert, Garcia, Richter, Siplin; General Government: Baker, Chair; Aronberg, Dean, Lawson, Oelrich; Health & Human Services: Peaden, Chair; Gaetz, Haridopolos, Negron, Rich, Sobel; Higher Education: Lynn, Chair; Constantine, Gelber, Thrasher; Trans & Econ Development: Fasano, Chair; Diaz de la Portilla, Dockery, Gardiner, Hill, Smith -SJ 00648 | |
2010-04-06 | In returning messages | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00501; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00502; Read 3rd time -HJ 00502; CS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 00502; Immediately certified -HJ 00526; Passed the Senate bill as amended by House and we accede to conference -HJ 00526 | |
2010-04-01 | Received -HJ 00471; Referred to Calendar -HJ 00471 | |
2010-03-31 | In Messages | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00390; Read 3rd time -SJ 00390; CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 1 -SJ 00390; Immediately certified -SJ 00390; Requests House concur or failing to concur appoint conference cmte -SJ 00407 | |
2010-03-26 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00350 | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable by- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -SJ 00349 | |
2010-03-22 | Original reference(s) removed: Rules; Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00304; On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 03/25/10, 1:30 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-19 | CS by Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 00279; CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -SJ 00288; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-16 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations, 03/19/10, 9:15 am, 37-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00098 | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules | |
2010-01-26 | Filed |