FL S1392 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Providing a tax exemption for the sale or lease of accessible vehicles, etc.
Title
Transportation Accessibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch. | |
2012-03-06 | In Messages | |
2012-03-06 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 878 | |
2012-03-06 | Read 3rd time -SJ 878 | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-05 | Read 2nd time -SJ 790 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/12 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-16 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 02/21/12, 3:45 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-02-09 | Now in Budget -SJ 484 | |
2012-02-09 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 484 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 02/09/12, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-31 | CS by Transportation read 1st time -SJ 306 | |
2012-01-31 | Now in Budget -SJ 306 | |
2012-01-30 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-26 | CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 306 | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/26/12, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-13 | Introduced -SJ 150 | |
2012-01-13 | Referred to Transportation; Budget -SJ 150 | |
2012-01-03 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |