FL S1384 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the executive director of the Board of Physical Therapy or her or his designee to serve as state delegate of the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact; creating the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact; providing findings and purpose; authorizing member states to take adverse action against a physical therapist's multistate licensure privilege, etc.
Title
Physical Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1386 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
H1097 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
H1099 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
H1097 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
H1099 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
486 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 0715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1384 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1384/BillText/Filed/HTML |