FL S1368 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a portion of Powerball net revenues to be allocated to voluntary prekindergarten education programs. Provides for the use of funds.
Title
Allocation & Expenditure of State Lottery Revenues
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 102 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Education Pre-K - 12; Budget -SJ 102 | |
2011-02-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0033 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1368 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1368/BillText/Filed/HTML |