FL S1352 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the formula for the adjusted state minimum wage; reducing over time the amount of tip credit an employer may claim; prohibiting an employer from claiming a tip credit beginning on a specified date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum Wage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2019-02-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H517 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
448110Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback