FL S1340 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the publication of legal notices on certain publicly accessible websites; allowing a governmental agency to publish legal notices on a publicly accessible website under certain circumstances; removing provisions relating to the publication of legal notices in newspapers; providing that an advertisement of a sale or disposition of property may be published on certain websites for a specified time period, etc.
Title
Legal Notices
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/19/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/11/20, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Amendment(s) Adopted - Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 0511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
162 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
189 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
190 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
190 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
197 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
200 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0308 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 635 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 7605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 0397 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 146 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 722 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 0211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 0311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 0711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
712 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
865 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
932 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |