FL S1340 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a family member of a patient or an interested party to petition a court for the appointment of a guardian advocate; establishing the Substance Abuse Assistance Pilot Program within the Department of Children and Families; authorizing an adult with capacity to execute a mental health or substance abuse treatment advance directive; prohibiting criminal prosecution of a health care facility, provider, or surrogate who acts pursuant to a mental health or substance abuse treatment decision, etc.
Title
Mental Health and Substance Abuse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2015-03-23 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/19/15, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/12/15, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1017 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
S7070 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 79 (Ch. 2015-102), CS/CS/HB 335 (Ch. 2015-111), CS/SB 954 (Ch. 2015-67)
H7119 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 79 (Ch. 2015-102)
S7068 (Similar To) 2015-04-29 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 79 (Ch. 2015-102), CS/CS/HB 335 (Ch. 2015-111), CS/CS/HB 1069 (Ch. 2015-178), CS/SB 954 (Ch. 2015-67)
S7070 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 79 (Ch. 2015-102), CS/CS/HB 335 (Ch. 2015-111), CS/SB 954 (Ch. 2015-67)
H7119 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 79 (Ch. 2015-102)
S7068 (Similar To) 2015-04-29 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 79 (Ch. 2015-102), CS/CS/HB 335 (Ch. 2015-111), CS/CS/HB 1069 (Ch. 2015-178), CS/SB 954 (Ch. 2015-67)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 459 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4598 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 467 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 46715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 496 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 9085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 0197 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 1051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0575 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 4015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |