FL S1338 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that health insurers and health maintenance organizations provide health insurance coverage for prescription contraceptive drugs and devices approved by the Food and Drug Administration and other related outpatient contraceptive services. Prohibits a health insurance policy or health maintenance contract from imposing an unusual copayment, coinsurance requirement, deductible, or waiting requirement for obtaining prescription contraceptive drugs or devices or certain outpatient contraceptive services, etc.
Title
Contraception
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 99 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 100 | |
2011-02-23 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 64194 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6614 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31099 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1338 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1338/BillText/Filed/HTML |