FL S1320 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a student may have the physical education requirement waived for a period of one semester each year under certain circumstances.
Title
Physical Education Instruction in Public Schools
Sponsors
Senate Education Pre-K - 12 Committee | Sen. Eleanor Sobel [D] | Sen. Ronda Storms [R] | Sen. Stephen Wise [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-05 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12 read 1st time -SJ 345 | |
2011-04-01 | Now in Budget -SJ 323 | |
2011-03-31 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-30 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 -SJ 323 | |
2011-03-25 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/30/11, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 98 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Budget -SJ 98 | |
2011-02-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H4169 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1186 () 2011-02-22 - Withdrawn prior to introduction -SJ 89
S1306 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0989 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1186 () 2011-02-22 - Withdrawn prior to introduction -SJ 89
S1306 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0989 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration