FL S1312 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that legislative intent includes the protection of specified forms of free speech; defining the phrase "free speech in connection with public issues", etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#318 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-70
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-24SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 1
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-23HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 1041
2015-04-21HouseReceived
2015-04-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-21HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-14HouseIn Messages
2015-04-08SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2015-04-08SenateAmendment(s) adopted (885072)
2015-04-08SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-02SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/02/15
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15
2015-03-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-03-19SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2015-03-17SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2015-03-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/19/15, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-12SenateNow in Rules
2015-03-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-10SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2015-03-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/10/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-03-02SenateReferred to Judiciary; Rules
2015-02-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1041 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1312 (Ch. 2015-70)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
768295Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback