FL S1306 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that interests in certain individual retirement funds or accounts which are exempt from creditor claims continue to be exempt after certain transfers incident to divorce, etc.
Title
Individual Retirement Accounts
Sponsors
Sen. Perry Thurston [D] | Sen. Gary Farmer [D] | Sen. Janet Cruz [D] | Sen. Audrey Gibson [D] |
Sen. Bobby Powell [D] | Sen. Annette Taddeo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/04/20, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/28/20, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H811 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1306 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1306/BillText/Filed/HTML |