FL S1306 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring K-12 comprehensive reading plans to provide for intensive reading interventions that are delivered by teachers who meet certain criteria beginning with a specified school year; requiring the Department of Education to consider the award of endorsements for a teaching certificate to individuals who hold specified certifications or who complete specified programs that meet certain criteria in a specified review; requiring school districts to provide access to training sufficient for certain instructional personnel to earn an endorsement in reading, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reading Instruction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-08SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education, 02/08/18, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-30SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education
2018-01-29SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 01/29/18, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced
2018-01-11SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations
2017-12-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H887 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012586Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101298Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback