FL S1304 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a bicycle sharing company to allow a minor to operate a bicycle reserved by a user if accompanied by a user; providing insurance requirements for a bicycle sharing company; authorizing a local governmental entity to annually require a bicycle sharing company to provide proof of insurance; authorizing a local governmental entity to issue a bicycle sharing company certain fines and fees and to impose other penalties under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bicycle Sharing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Community Affairs
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-08SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/13/18, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
2018-02-08SenateNow in Community Affairs
2018-02-08SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-06SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 2
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/06/18, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced
2018-01-11SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Rules
2017-12-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1033 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
341851Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback