FL S1304 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the mailing method to be used in providing notice following the issuance of a citation for failure to pay a toll. Authorizes any governmental entity, including the clerk of court, to provide specified data to the HSMV regarding outstanding violations for failure to pay tolls. Clarifies that failure to pay a toll does not result in the assessment of points against a person's driving record, etc.
Title
Enforcement of Tolls [CPSC]
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Transportation; Finance and Tax; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00093 | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Transportation; Finance and Tax; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations | |
2010-01-21 | SPB 7030 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1304) by Transportation; Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2362 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00951; Amendment(s) adopted (952892, 944398, 680794, 664724, 542644, 339374, 327358, 237082) -SJ 00952; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 -SJ 00954; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225), CS/CS/CS/SB 550 (Ch. 2010-205) -SJ 00954
H1271 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-225; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 550 (Ch. 2010-205)
H1271 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-225; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 550 (Ch. 2010-205)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0316 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0320 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |