FL S1298 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing registered nurses to delegate to certified nursing assistants and home health aides the administration of certain medication to patients of nurse registries under certain circumstances; authorizing certified nursing assistants to administer certain medication to patients of nurse registries under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nurse Registries

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-24SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2021-02-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1045 (Same As) 2021-04-02 - Now in Health & Human Services Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4640156Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4642035Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback