FL S1286 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a specialty license for certain medical facilities that have centers in the facility which specialize in caring for children; providing requirements for an individualized plan of care for each child; requiring employees of a center to receive instruction on the prevention and control of infection, the prevention of accident, and safety awareness; requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to pay Medicaid's prevailing rate only for bed-hold days if the facility or a children's specialty care center has an occupancy rate of 95 percent or greater; authorizing the agency to provide home and community-based services for children and adults who are medically fragile, etc.
Title
Children and Adults Who Have Extensive Medical Needs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1351 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 906 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1286 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1286/BillText/Filed/HTML |