FL S1272 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that adult education general education development test preparation courses and adult education career education courses may be offered as electives to high school level students who have a transition plan that does not include a return to public high school.
Title
Educational Services in DJJ Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-29 | Now in Higher Education -SJ 300 | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 300 | |
2011-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/28/11, 3:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 94 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Higher Education; Budget -SJ 94 | |
2011-02-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0611 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1272 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1272/BillText/Filed/HTML |