FL S1256 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1281 (Ch. 2023-285)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1281 (Ch. 2023-285)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting certain local governmental entities, subject to specified exceptions, from enacting or enforcing a resolution, an ordinance, a rule, a code, or a policy or from taking any action that restricts or prohibits or has the effect of restricting or prohibiting the use of appliances; revising an exception to preemption, etc.
Title
Preemption Over Utility Service Restrictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1281 (Ch. 2023-285) |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1281 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 1 |
2023-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-04-11 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Rules |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Regulated Industries |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/05/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1281 (Same As) 2023-06-22 - Chapter No. 2023-285