FL S1256 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1149 (Ch. 2016-100)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1149 (Ch. 2016-100)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the chief judge of each judicial circuit, in consultation with specified entities, to establish an alternative sanctioning program; authorizing an offender who allegedly committed a technical violation of supervision to waive participation in or elect to participate in the program, admit to the violation, agree to comply with the recommended sanction, and agree to waive certain rights; authorizing the court to impose the recommended sanction or direct the Department of Corrections to submit a violation report, affidavit, and warrant to the court; specifying that an offender's participation in an alternative sanctioning program is voluntary, etc.
Title
Alternative Sanctioning
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1149 (Ch. 2016-100) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1149 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/16 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/25/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/17/16, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-09 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/11/16, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/01/16, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2015-12-29 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1149 (Same As) 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-100