FL S1252 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying circumstances under which products liability actions may not be brought against distributors, dealers, or applicators of pesticides, etc.
Title
Exemptions from Products Liability Actions
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Collins [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Agriculture |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Now in Agriculture |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Agriculture; Rules |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H347 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died on Calendar