FL S1250 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding the categories of persons who may prescribe brand name drugs under the prescription drug program when medically necessary; authorizing procedures for recommending admission of a patient to a treatment facility; providing that certain licensing boards must require specified licensees to complete a specified continuing education course that includes a section on human trafficking as a condition of relicensure or recertification; specifying acts that constitute grounds for denial of a license or for disciplinary action against an advanced registered nurse practitioner, etc.
Title
Health Care Workforce
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs Committee | Sen. Denise Grimsley [R] | Sen. Jack Latvala [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 977 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/16 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-03 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/01/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/24/16, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2016-02-11 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/10/16, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2015-12-29 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0977 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-231, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224)
H0423 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-224, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 221 (Ch. 2016-222), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231), HB 1241 (Ch. 2016-145)
S0210 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231), SB 586 (Ch. 2016-113)
S0428 (Similar To) 2015-10-07 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231), SB 586 (Ch. 2016-113)
S0676 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231), HB 1241 (Ch. 2016-145), SB 586 (Ch. 2016-113)
S0012 (Similar To) 2016-04-15 - Chapter No. 2016-241, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 373 (Ch. 2016-80), CS/CS/CS/HB 439 (Ch. 2016-127), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65)
S2508 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65)
H0469 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
S0818 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
S0918 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 941 (Ch. 2016-230), CS/HB 375 (Ch. 2016-125), HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25)
H0423 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-224, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 221 (Ch. 2016-222), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231), HB 1241 (Ch. 2016-145)
S0210 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231), SB 586 (Ch. 2016-113)
S0428 (Similar To) 2015-10-07 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231), SB 586 (Ch. 2016-113)
S0676 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231), HB 1241 (Ch. 2016-145), SB 586 (Ch. 2016-113)
S0012 (Similar To) 2016-04-15 - Chapter No. 2016-241, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 373 (Ch. 2016-80), CS/CS/CS/HB 439 (Ch. 2016-127), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65)
S2508 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65)
H0469 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
S0818 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
S0918 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 941 (Ch. 2016-230), CS/HB 375 (Ch. 2016-125), HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 12315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0848 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 453 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 467 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 1051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 909 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 3265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 347 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 3475 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 348 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 0137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 0205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 0158 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 02751 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |