FL S1236 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that the tax levied under ch. 212, F.S., is not required to be collected on the sale of items or articles of certain tangible personal property by certain small businesses during a specified period, etc.
Title
Small Business Saturday Sales Tax Holiday
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2016-02-18 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/16/16, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-09 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/01/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-12-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0721 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
H7099 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Chapter No. 2016-220, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 698 (Ch. 2016-190)
H7099 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Chapter No. 2016-220, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 698 (Ch. 2016-190)