FL S1236 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the gradual reduction of the corporate income tax rate and the termination of the tax over a specified time. Provides for the revenue from the cigarette surcharge to be deposited into the General Revenue Fund. Provides for the revenue from the surcharge on tobacco products to be deposited into the General Revenue Fund. Specifies additional taxes against which a taxpayer may claim a credit for an eligible contribution to an eligible nonprofit scholarship-funding organization to include taxes or surcharges on tobacco products, etc.
Title
State Revenues
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-21 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/26/11, 9:45 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Received | |
2011-04-20 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/25/11, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 92 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Budget -SJ 92 | |
2011-02-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0503 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1222 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1222 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 276 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1236 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1236/BillText/Filed/HTML |