FL S1228 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died, not introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing April 18, 2019, as "FAMU Day" in Florida, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FAMU Day

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied, not introduced
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-02-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H8057 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Adopted by Publication

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback