FL S1216 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that the report to the Department of Health of allegations of sexual misconduct by a licensed health care practitioner be made within a specified timeframe; increasing penalties for violations by licensed facilities, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Providers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-19SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3950197Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback