FL S1206 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising a prohibition on the sale or transfer of firearms to persons convicted of misdemeanor domestic violence offenses; prohibiting persons convicted of a misdemeanor offense of domestic violence from possessing a firearm or ammunition; requiring persons convicted of misdemeanor offenses of domestic violence to surrender all firearms and ammunition in their possession upon conviction; requiring a law enforcement officer to remove firearms from the scene of an alleged act of domestic violence under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Domestic Violence
Sponsors
Sen. Lori Berman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H941 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
790 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 233 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1206 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1206/BillText/Filed/HTML |