FL S1206 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 487 (Ch. 2014-33)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 487 (Ch. 2014-33)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to annually provide to the State Board of Education and the Department of Education information and industry certifications for farm occupations to be considered for placement on industry certification funding lists; defining the term "industry certification"; requiring the state board to adopt rules for implementing an industry certification process for farm occupations, etc.
Title
Agricultural Industry Certifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 487 (Ch. 2014-33) |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 487 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/14 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/24/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/22/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 04/07/14, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-04-01 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Now in Agriculture |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Agriculture; Appropriations |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/25/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/18/14, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Education; Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0487 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-33
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 492 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |