FL S1206 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cites this act as the "Eyewitness Identification Reform Act." Requires state, county, municipal, and other law enforcement agencies that conduct lineups to follow certain specified procedures. Requires the eyewitness to sign an acknowledgement that he or she received the instructions about the lineup procedures from the law enforcement agency. Requires the Criminal Justice Standards and Training Commission to create educational materials and conduct training programs on how to conduct lineups in compliance with the act, etc.
Title
Eyewitness Identification
Sponsors
Senate Criminal Justice Committee | Sen. Arthenia Joyner [D] | Senate Judiciary Committee | Sen. Joe Negron [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#47 (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-29 | In Messages | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time -SJ 601 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/11 | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-25 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-20 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/25/11, 1:15 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-04-07 | Now in Budget -SJ 408 | |
2011-04-06 | CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time -SJ 410 | |
2011-04-05 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-04 | CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 408 | |
2011-03-30 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 300 | |
2011-03-29 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-28 | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 -SJ 300 | |
2011-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/28/11, 3:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 90 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 90 | |
2011-02-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0821 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration