FL S1206 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes amendments to the State Constitution relating to the property tax exemption for a renewable energy source device and the property on which the device is installed and operated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax Exemption/Renewable Energy [WPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
2010-04-07 Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00524
2010-04-06 Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00524
2010-04-01 On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/06/10, 3:15 pm, 301-S
2010-03-18 Now in Finance and Tax -SJ 00269
2010-03-17 Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 00269
2010-03-12 On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/17/10, 3:15 pm, 412-K
2010-03-04 Favorable by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00188; Now in Community Affairs -SJ 00188
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00087; On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 03/04/10, 1:00 pm, 301-S
2010-03-01 On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 03/04/10, 1:00 pm, 301-S
2010-01-20 Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules
2010-01-14 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
00704New CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback